This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 10/12/2021 at 04:04:04 (UTC).

Bank Of America N.a. vs. Larry N. Williams

Case Summary

On 09/22/2021 Bank Of America N a filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Larry N Williams. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************9750

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bank Of America N.a.

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

Williams, Larry N.

Fort Worth, TX 76131

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew W. Cooper

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketClerk Follow Up/3 Months: (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Swearingin, Ralph, JR) : 12/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: Return of Service//EFILED//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketCITATION: ABC/KAC; Williams, Larry N.: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketEmailed: TO ABC LEGAL//KAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1-2021-00579: Bank Of America N.a.: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Bank Of America N.a.; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: EFILED//EMAIL TO: mjscourts@abclegal.com //MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew W Cooper