Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/14/2021 at 06:55:47 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. vs. JEFF SCOTT, JR.

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 BANK OF AMERICA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JEFF SCOTT, JR. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Curnutt, Mary Tom. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0162

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Curnutt, Mary Tom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

Defendant

SCOTT, JR., JEFF

Arlington, TX 76016

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew W. Cooper

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketEmailed: JUDGMENT TO PLTF ATTY, MAILED TO DEFN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Judgment for Plaintiff; (Judicial Officer: Curnutt, Mary Tom) ; Judgment of $6,913.17; Awarded To: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.; Awarded Against: JEFF SCOTT, JR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketComments: JUDGMENT FOR PLTF $6913.17 PLUS CC & INT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial: (9:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerCurnutt, Mary Tom) : Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketExhibit(s) Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketExhibit(s) Filed: Plaintiffs' Trial Exhibits

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketNotice: Plaintiffs' Cover Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • DocketEmailed: RESET HEARING NOTICE & ZOOM INFO TO PLTF ATTY, MAILED TO DEFN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketLetter Mailed for Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution: SEE TEXAS RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 503.1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow up/ Answer Due; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialMail Payment: Receipt # JP2-2019-06137: ABC LEGAL SERVICES, LLC: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCITATION: SCOTT, JR., JEFF: Served: 12/19/2019; Returned: 12/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew W Cooper