This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 11/17/2022 at 15:19:58 (UTC).

Bank Of America N.a. vs. James A. Spencer

Case Summary

On 09/30/2022 Bank Of America N a filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against James A Spencer. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 3 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************9181

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bank Of America N.a.

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

Spencer, James A.

Keller, TX 76248

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paula K Pitter

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketClerk Follow Up: (8:00 AM) ()

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketComments: DEFN HAS DEFAULTED. COURT TO AWAIT PLTF'S ATTY TO REQUEST PROVE UP SETTING OR SUBMIT MOTION FOR DEFAULT/CL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added): $86.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketLetter Issued: TO DEFN; COURT NOTIFIED OF SERVICE. HM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketAnswer Due On: HM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP3-2022-04051: Bank Of America N.a.: (33.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Bank Of America N.a.; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketCitation Returned: SERVED IN PERSON ON 9/30/22 AT 4:04PM. HM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketCITATION: Spencer, James A.: Served: 09/30/2022; Returned: 10/03/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketCitation Issued: TO PPS FOR SERVICE.AMW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Attorney Cover Letter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening): SCOTT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PITTER, PAULA K