This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 02/23/2020 at 10:38:16 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. vs. ERIC K. HENDERSON

Case Summary

On 09/27/2018 BANK OF AMERICA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ERIC K HENDERSON. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Brandt, William P. "Bill". The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************7908

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Brandt, William P. "Bill"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

Defendants

HENDERSON, ERIC K

Hurst, TX 76054

HENDERSON, ERIC K.

Hurst, TX 76054

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brittany Brantley

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2019
  • FinancialCounter Payment: Receipt # JP3-2019-05005: Brantley, Brittany: (1.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketDispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Brandt, William P. "Bill") ; Judgment of $8,911.42; Awarded To: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.; Awarded Against: ERIC HENDERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketOrder Entered on Case: DEFAULT JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. JUDGMENT FOR PLTF, $8,911.42. + CC @ 5.5% INT. COPY MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. HM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketPre-Trial Mediation: (8:30 AM) (Judicial OfficerBrandt, William P. "Bill")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketHearing Letter Mailed: TO ALL PARTIES PRE-TRIAL MEDIATION SET FOR 8/08/19 @ 8:30 AM. MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketComments: AT TIME OF MEDIATION, NEITHER PARTY APPEARED. MEDIATION TO BE CONTINUED. FILE PLACED IN MEDIATION BIN/CL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketPre-Trial Mediation: (8:45 AM) (Judicial OfficerBrandt, William P. "Bill")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketHearing Letter Mailed: TO BOTH PARTIES. MEDIATION SET FOR 5-30-19 AT 8:45 AM IN HURST/CL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketComments: FILE PLACED IN MEDIATION BIN/CL

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketComments: DEFN HAS DEFAULTED. COURT TO AWAIT PLTF'S ATTY TO REQUEST PROVE UP SETTING OR SUBMIT MOTION FOR DEFAULT/CL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketLetter Issued: TO DEFN. COURT NOTIFIED OF SERVICE/CL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added): FROM ABC LEGAL/CL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketAnswer Due On: CL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • DocketCitation Returned: DEFN SERVED IN PERSON ON 11-10-18 AT 11:46 AM BY ABC LEGAL/CL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • DocketCITATION: HENDERSON, ERIC K.: Served: 11/10/2018; Returned: 11/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • DocketComments: CITATION ISSUED FOR PICKUP.MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • FinancialCounter Payment: Receipt # JP3-2018-04535: SCOTT & ASSOCIATES: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.; Total Financial Assessment: 47.00; Total Payments and Credits: 47.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening): (SCOTT & ASSOC)

    Read MoreRead Less