This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 08/11/2022 at 09:22:07 (UTC).

Bank Of America N.a. vs. Brian S. Beard

Case Summary

On 07/01/2022 Bank Of America N a filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Brian S Beard. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************6409

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bank Of America N.a.

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

Beard, Brian S.

Bedford, TX 76022

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew W. Cooper

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketClerk Follow Up: (8:00 AM) ()

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up/3 Months; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up; (8:00 AM) () ; Continuance Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketEmailed: RETAIN TO PLTF ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketOrder to Retain Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketProposed Order: Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketMotion to Retain Filed: Motion to Retain

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketNotice: Cover Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketLetter Mailed for Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution: CITATION RETURNED UNEXECUTED - DEFENDANT UNABLE TO LOCATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: Non-Service Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP2-2022-05185: Bank Of America N.a.: (33.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Bank Of America N.a.; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketCITATION: EMAILED TO MJSCOURTS@ABCLEGAL.COM; Beard, Brian S.: Returned Unserved 07/12/2022; Returned: 07/12/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketMilitary Unknown

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew W Cooper