This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 01/19/2023 at 20:36:31 (UTC).

Balboa Capital Corporation, a California Corporation vs Generations Community Federal Credit Union and Generations Federal Credit Union

Case Summary

On 11/21/2022 Balboa Capital Corporation, a California Corporation filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against Generations Community Federal Credit Union and Generations Federal Credit Union. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court at Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Rymell, Jennifer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********15-2

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Rymell, Jennifer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Balboa Capital Corporation

a California Corporation

Defendants

Generations Community Federal Credit Union

9311 San Pedro Ave., Suite 1100

San Antonio, TX 78216

B/S CEO/Manager, Kenneth Raymie

Generations Federal Credit Union

1828 N. St. Mary'S Street

San Antonio, TX 78212

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Owen Babcock

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Judgment or Order Signed Index # 8: Electronically served to Party's attorney and/or mailed to all pro-se parties

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketDispositions: Order of Non Suit; (Judicial Officer: Rymell, Jennifer)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketOrder for Non-Suit Index # 7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketJudge Docket Entry: Signed Non-suit- Both def.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Non-Suit Index # 6: Without Prejudice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketNotice Index # 5: of Writ of Garnishment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketWrit of Garnishment: Hold for Padfield & Stout; Generations Community Federal Credit Union: Unserved ; Generations Federal Credit Union: Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (137.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-187594: Balboa Capital Corporation: (244.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Balboa Capital Corporation; Total Financial Assessment: 381.00; Total Payments and Credits: 381.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 381.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketLetter Index # 3: RE: Issuance of Writ of Garnishment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketAffidavit Index # 4: Declaration for Writ of Garnishment after Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Post Garnishment Index # 2: Application for Writ of Garnishment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Post Garnishment Index # 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A CALIFORNIA LIMITED CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where BALBOA CAPITAL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Owen Babcock