This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 01/07/2020 at 08:18:59 (UTC).

AV CARRIAGE HOUSE APTS vs. CHARLOTTE BROWN-HODGES AND ALL OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 AV CARRIAGE HOUSE APTS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CHARLOTTE BROWN-HODGES AND ALL OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Curnutt, Mary Tom. The case status is Pending - Appeal.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5137

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Appeal

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Curnutt, Mary Tom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AV CARRIAGE HOUSE APTS

1500 Lamar Blvd East

Arlington, TX 76011

Defendant

BROWN-HODGES, CHARLOTTE

Arlington, TX 76011

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2019
  • Dispositions: Judgment for Plaintiff; (Judicial Officer: Curnutt, Mary Tom) ; Judgment of $2,066.66; Awarded To: AV CARRIAGE HOUSE APTS; Awarded Against: CHARLOTTE BROWN-HODGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • Appeal Perfected & All Paperwork Sent To County Court At Law

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • Check Issued to CCL with Appeal for One Month's Rent Paid: CHECK #10006 FOR $1,240.00 PAYABLE TO TARRANT COUNTY CLERK REQUESTED FROM AUDITOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • Transcript of Judgment on Appeal Prepared

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • Statement of Inability to Pay for Appeal Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • Defn Paid Rent into Court Registry on Appeal: 1240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • Hearing: (10:15 AM) (Judicial OfficerCurnutt, Mary Tom) : Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • CANCELED: Eviction Clerk Appeal Follow Up; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • Comments: ADVISED YOLANDA W/PLTF AND LEFT V/M W/DEF REGARDING SIP HEARING DATE AND TIME - MAILED SETTING LETTER TO BOTH PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • Statement of Inability to Pay for Appeal Contested

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2019
  • During the Pendency of Appeal, the Interm Rent Due Is

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial: (9:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerCurnutt, Mary Tom) : Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • Request For Alternate Service Filed and Approved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • EVICTION: BROWN-HODGES, CHARLOTTE: Served: 12/11/2019; Returned: 12/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Citation Issued:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Military Affidavit Filed: IS IN MILITARY & NOT ACTIVE DUTY -HM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Email Consent by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # JP2-2019-06129: AVPM CORP PETTY CASH: (121.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff AV CARRIAGE HOUSE APTS; Total Financial Assessment: 121.00; Total Payments and Credits: 121.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 121.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.