This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 05/12/2022 at 08:38:38 (UTC).

Automotive Finance Corporation vs Teofilo Hernandez d/b/a Renovao Auto Sales

Case Summary

On 01/13/2022 Automotive Finance Corporation filed an Other lawsuit against Teofilo Hernandez d/b/a Renovao Auto Sales. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Pierson, Don. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********90-1

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Pierson, Don

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Automotive Finance Corporation

420 Throckmorton Street Suite 1210

Fort Worth, TX 76102

c/o Alan B. Padfield

Defendants

Hernandez , Teofilo

Houston, TX 77088

d/b/a Renovao Auto Sales

or wherever he may be found

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

E. Grace Bregard

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment Index # 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-181437: Automotive Finance Corporation: (8.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketRequest for Abstract of Judgment w/Copy Index # 11: AJ Request

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketRule 239a Notice of Default Judgment Index # 9: Electronically served to Party's attorney and/or mailed to all pro-se parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketDispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Pierson, Don)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketJudgment - Default Index # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketMotion for Default W/Supporting Affidavits Index # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Judgment or Order Signed Index # 5: Electronically served to Party's attorney and/or mailed to all pro-se parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketOrder for Rule 106 Index # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketMotion Rule 106 w/Diligent Attempt Index # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (137.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-179102: Automotive Finance Corporation: (221.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Automotive Finance Corporation; Total Financial Assessment: 366.00; Total Payments and Credits: 366.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 358.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketCitation: Mail to Attorney; Hernandez , Teofilo: Served: 03/10/2022; Returned: 03/22/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketLetter Index # 3: Issuance Request

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2: Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Automotive Finance Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer E. Grace Bregard