This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 01/24/2022 at 08:14:58 (UTC).

Automotive Finance Corporation vs Old Republic Surety Company

Case Summary

On 10/22/2021 Automotive Finance Corporation filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Old Republic Surety Company. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********89-2

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Automotive Finance Corporation

Defendant

Old Republic Surety Company

1019 Brazos Street

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

IVAN ESCOBAR

Defendant Attorney

KENDAL B REED

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer Index # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 4: Old Republic Surety Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-177192: Automotive Finance Corporation: (262.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Automotive Finance Corporation; Total Financial Assessment: 262.00; Total Payments and Credits: 262.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 262.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketCitation: Hold for Padfield & Stout; Old Republic Surety Company: Served: 11/03/2021; Returned: 11/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketLetter Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Automotive Finance Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ESCOBAR, IVAN