This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 10/23/2021 at 08:15:42 (UTC).

Automotive Finance Corporation vs First National Bank Texas

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 Automotive Finance Corporation filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against First National Bank Texas. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********96-3

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Automotive Finance Corporation

Defendants

First National Bank Texas

507 N. Gray

Killeen, TX 76541

b/s Registered Agent, James W. Meredith

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Owen Babcock

Defendant Attorney

Samuel T Kinslow

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Judgment or Order Signed Index # 10: Electronically served to Party's attorney and/or mailed to all pro-se parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Order of Non Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketOrder for Non-Suit Index # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Non-Suit Index # 8: Without Prejudice as to Garnishee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer Index # 7: To Writ of Garnishment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 6: Original Writ of Garnishment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Garnishment Index # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-170250: Automotive Finance Corporation: (234.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Automotive Finance Corporation; Total Financial Assessment: 234.00; Total Payments and Credits: 234.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 234.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketWrit of Garnishment: Hold for padfield and Stout p/u 03/05/2021 p/u; First National Bank Texas: Served: 03/09/2021; Returned: 03/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketLetter Index # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketAffidavit Index # 3: Declaration of Garnishment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Post Garnishment Index # 2: Application of Garnishment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Post Garnishment Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where First National Bank Texas is a litigant

Latest cases where Automotive Finance Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Samuel T Kinslow