This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 02/15/2017 at 07:33:12 (UTC).

AUTO RECYCLERS INC DBA SALON & SPA GALLERIA vs. LAVETRA MOLIN

Case Summary

On 12/21/2015 AUTO RECYCLERS INC DBA SALON SPA GALLERIA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LAVETRA MOLIN. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 7 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Hayes, Matt. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************7640

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Hayes, Matt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AUTO RECYCLERS INC DBA SALON & SPA GALLERIA

Defendant

MOLIN, LAVETRA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2016
  • DocketDispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Hayes, Matt) ; Judgment of $1,294.20; Awarded To: AUTO RECYCLERS INC DBA SALON & SPA GALLERIA; Awarded Against: LAVETRA MOLIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment Issued and Mailed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment Requested

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • DocketHistorical Comments - Default Judgment Entered: FOR PLTF $1294.20 PLUS CC & INT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • DocketProve Up Hearings: (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Hayes, Matt) : Result: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • DocketPlaintiff Requested Default Prove-Up Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • DocketLetter Mailed for Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution: SEE TEXAS RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 503.1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • DocketLetter Mailed for Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution: CITATION WAS ISSUED OVER 60 DAYS AGO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • DocketCITATION: DALLAS CO, SOUTH DALLAS GOV'T CTR, 7201 S POLK, DALLAS, TX 75232; MOLIN, LAVETRA: Served: 04/20/2016; Returned: 04/28/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • DocketMail Payment: Receipt # JP7-2016-06364: AUTO RECYCLERS INC DBA SALON & SPA GALLERIA: (5.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • DocketTransaction Assessment: 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • DocketMail Payment: Receipt # JP7-2015-07516: AUTO RECYCLERS INC DBA SALON & SPA GALLERIA: (41.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • DocketFinancial Information: Plaintiff AUTO RECYCLERS INC DBA SALON & SPA GALLERIA; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due as of 02/15/2017: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 41.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AUTO RECYCLERS INC DBA SALON & SPA GALLERIA is a litigant