This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 03/11/2017 at 20:58:41 (UTC).

Atkins North America, Inc. vs Rusly Oliva-Salgado, and S Z Transport, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/19/2015 Atkins North America, Inc filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Rusly Oliva-Salgado, and S Z Transport, Inc. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********89-2

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Atkins North America, Inc.

1616 South Voss Rd., Suite 775

Houston, TX 77057

Defendants

Oliva-Salgado, Rusly

Fort Worth, TX 76116

S Z Transport, Inc.

3353 Sheila Lane

Dallas, TX 75220

b/s Mario A. Smith, Registered Agent

Dallas, TX 75220

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher A. Fusselman

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2015
  • Dispositions: Order of Dismissal With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • Returned Mail Doc ID#9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • Civil Docket Doc ID#8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • Order of Dismissal With Prejudice Doc ID#7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • Letter Doc ID#6: RE: Motion and Order to Dismiss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • Motion to Dismiss Doc ID#5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • Citation: citations mailed to atty.; Oliva-Salgado, Rusly: Unserved ; S Z Transport, Inc.: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2015
  • Letter Doc ID#4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2015
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID#3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2015
  • Original Petition Doc ID#2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2015
  • Original Petition Doc ID#1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-70235: Atkins North America, Inc.: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • Transaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-56110: Atkins North America, Inc.: (249.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff Atkins North America, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment: 251.00; Total Payments and Credits: 251.00; Balance Due as of 03/11/2017: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 249.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Atkins North America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher A Fusselman