Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/07/2017 at 12:41:05 (UTC).

ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC vs. PRADEEP KUMAR BANDELA

Case Summary

On 12/31/2012 ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC filed an Other lawsuit against PRADEEP KUMAR BANDELA. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************4773

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC

TARGET NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

BANDELA, PRADEEP KUMAR

N Richland Hills, TX 76180-6366

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JOHNETTA LANG

Andrew R Herreth

Defendant Attorney

Thomas W. McKenzie

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2014
  • File Returned to Records Management Warehouse: FOR SCANNING. RB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2014
  • CANCELED: Non-Jury Trial; (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Swearingin, Ralph, JR) ; Other; LTRS TO ALL PARTIES//ET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2014
  • Comments: PLTF'S ATTY DID NOT APR**DEFN'S ATTY APRD**DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION**COPIES TO ALL PARTIES//ET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2014
  • Non-Jury Trial: (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Swearingin, Ralph, JR) : LTRS TO ALL PARTIES//ET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2014
  • Substitution of Attorney of Record Filed: MOTION TO WITHDRAW COUNSEL & SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL & DESIGNATION OF ATTY IN CHARGE FILED BY JOHNETTA LANG//RC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2013
  • Comments: ALL PARTIES APRD**BOTH PARTIES AGREED REQ FOR CONTINANCE**GRANTED 60 DAYS CONTINUANCE//ET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2013
  • Non-Jury Trial: (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Swearingin, Ralph, JR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2013
  • Notice of Filing of Business Records Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2013
  • Notice: NEW LAW NOTICE MLD TO BOTH PARTIES.HH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2013
  • Letter Received by the Court: ALONG W/CK FOR MEDIATON ON 6-14-2013 MADE OUT TO TARRANT JUSTICE OF THE PEACE**LTR SENT ASKING TO RE ISSUE CKS MADE OUT TO MEDIATOR//ET

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2013
  • Certificate of Written Discovery Filed: BY PLTF'S ATTY//ET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2013
  • Certificate of Written Discovery Filed: BY DEFFN'S ATTY//ET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • Answer Filed: BY ATTY//ET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2013
  • Answer Due On: DISC DUE 03/11/2013//ET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2012
  • CITATION: BANDELA, PRADEEP KUMAR: Served: 01/18/2013; Returned: 01/23/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2012
  • Generate Label

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2012
  • Comments: CITN ISSUED TO ABC LEGAL.HH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2012
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2012
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # JP1-2012-05187: FULTON FRIEDMAN & GULLACE LLP: (31.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2012
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff TARGET NATIONAL BANK; Total Financial Assessment: 31.00; Total Payments and Credits: 31.00; Balance Due as of 03/07/2017: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 31.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TARGET NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas W. McKenzie