Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 03/30/2017 at 05:00:50 (UTC).

Assa Abloy Entrance Systems US Inc vs AB Glass & Glazing LLC d/b/a AB Glass & Glazing Solutions

Case Summary

On 02/13/2017 Assa Abloy Entrance Systems US Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AB Glass Glazing LLC d/b/a AB Glass Glazing Solutions. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********01-3

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Assa Abloy Entrance Systems US Inc

Defendants

b/s Charly Everett, its Registered Agent

Hurst, TX 76053

d/b/a AB Glass & Glazing Solutions

113 Souder Dr.

Hurst, TX 76053

AB Glass & Glazing LLC

113 Souder Dr.

Hurst, TX 76053

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Craig J. Luffy

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2017
  • Paper Returned Doc ID#5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • Citation: Alliance Civil Process; AB Glass & Glazing LLC: Served: 02/27/2017; Returned: 03/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2017
  • Letter Doc ID#4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2017
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID#3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2017
  • Original Petition Doc ID#2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2017
  • Original Petition Doc ID#1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-119153: Assa Abloy Entrance Systems US Inc: (261.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff Assa Abloy Entrance Systems US Inc; Total Financial Assessment: 261.00; Total Payments and Credits: 261.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 261.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ASSA ABLOY ENTRANCE SYSTEMS US INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Craig J. Luffy