This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 01/27/2023 at 16:38:38 (UTC).

ASHTON APARTMENTS LLC, DBA ASHTON APARTMENT HOMES vs. ANTAQANETTE GUNNELL AND ALL OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 11/29/2022 ASHTON APARTMENTS LLC, DBA ASHTON APARTMENT HOMES filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ANTAQANETTE GUNNELL AND ALL OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 4 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory, Christopher. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4080

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ASHTON APARTMENTS LLC, DBA ASHTON APARTMENT HOMES

6300 La Calma Dr Ste 150

Austin, TX 78752

Defendant

GUNNELL, ANTAQANETTE

Saginaw, TX 76179

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketDispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Gregory, Christopher) ; Judgment of $3,316.71; Awarded To: ASHTON APARTMENTS LLC, DBA ASHTON APARTMENT HOMES; Awarded Against: ANTAQANETTE GUNNELL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketEmailed: TO PLTF, MAILED TO DEFN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketEviction Hearing: (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gregory, Christopher) : Result: Judgment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketCitation Returned: EXC 12/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketOrder Approving Alternate Service Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialCounter Payment: Receipt # JP4-2022-5998: NATIONWID COMPLIANT: (129.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 75.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff ASHTON APARTMENTS LLC, DBA ASHTON APARTMENT HOMES; Total Financial Assessment: 129.00; Total Payments and Credits: 129.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketEmailed: PETTION AND CITATION TO CO1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCITATION: GUNNELL, ANTAQANETTE: Served: 12/01/2022; Returned: 12/02/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketEmail Consent by Plaintiff: filing@nationwidecompliant.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketMilitary Status Proof Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketMilitary Affidavit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCitation Issued: CO1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ashton Apartment Homes is a litigant