Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 03/30/2017 at 05:01:34 (UTC).

Ashley Danielle Siebert vs Ex Parte

Case Summary

On 02/13/2017 Ashley Danielle Siebert filed an Other lawsuit against Ex Parte. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Hrabal, Mike. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********12-3

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Hrabal, Mike

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Siebert, Ashley Danielle

North Richland Hills, TX 76128

Defendant

Ex Parte

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Anna Summersett

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2017
  • Dispositions: Final Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Hrabal, Mike)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Civil Docket Doc ID#5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Final Judgment Doc ID#4: Occupational Driver's License

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2017
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID#3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2017
  • Original Petition Doc ID#2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2017
  • Petition - Occupational Drivers License Doc ID#1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • Counter: Receipt # CCL-0366597: LINDSAY WOZNIAK: (26.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • Transaction Assessment: 26.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-119163: Siebert, Ashley Danielle: (249.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff Siebert, Ashley Danielle; Total Financial Assessment: 275.00; Total Payments and Credits: 275.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 249.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anna Summersett