Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/23/2021 at 08:13:42 (UTC).

Aro Terrell vs 3D Logistics TX, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 Aro Terrell filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against 3D Logistics TX, LLC. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********06-2

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Terrell, Aro

Defendants

3D Logistics TX, LLC

1233 Patricia Lane

Highland Village, TX 75077

b/s its Registered Agent, Donna Davis

Highland Village, TX 75077

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Roland P Schafer

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketPaper Returned Index #3: (3D Logistics TX LLC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCitation: Hold For Atty 03/12/2021 p/u; 3D Logistics TX, LLC: Served: 03/23/2021; Returned: 03/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-170235: Terrell, Aro: (4.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketRequest: Letter to Clerk Requesting citations / Hold For Atty Pick Up

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-170103: Terrell, Aro: (254.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Terrell, Aro; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 254.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index #1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Roland P Schafer