This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/14/2017 at 08:51:47 (UTC).

ARLINGTON INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT vs. CONNIE WILKERSON

Case Summary

On 08/31/2015 ARLINGTON INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against CONNIE WILKERSON. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 7 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Hayes, Matt. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0973

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Hayes, Matt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARLINGTON INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

Defendant

WILKERSON, CONNIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHARLES E BRADY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2016
  • DocketDispositions: Dismissed for Want of Prosecution; (Judicial Officer: Hayes, Matt)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • DocketLetter/Notice Returned Undelivered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal/Want of Prosecution W/O Prejudice Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • DocketLetter Mailed for Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution: ON APRIL 7, 2016, CITATION RETURNED UNEXECUTED, PREMISES LOCATED AT ADDRESS PROVIDED FOR DEFENDANT IS VACANT PER CONSTABLE SERVICE REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • DocketCitation Returned Unexecuted - Property Vacant: PER CONSTABLE SERVICE REPORT ON 4TH AMENDED PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • DocketCITATION: RTND TO PLTF ATTY FOR SERVICE; WILKERSON, CONNIE: Returned Unserved 04/07/2016; Returned: 04/07/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • DocketAmended Petition Filed: 4TH AMENDED PETITION, $75.00 SERVICE FEE FROM C07

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • DocketLetter Mailed for Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution: ON MARCH 2, 2016 CITATION WAS RETURNED UNEXECUTED PREMISES VACANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • DocketCITATION: RETURN TO PLTF ATTY FOR SERVICE; WILKERSON, CONNIE: Returned Unserved 03/02/2016; Returned: 03/02/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • DocketAmended Petition Filed: THIRD AMENDED PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/15/2015
  • DocketCITATION: RETURNED TO PLTF ATTY FOR SERVICE; WILKERSON, CONNIE: Returned Unserved 01/19/2016; Returned: 01/19/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • DocketAmended Petition Filed: $75.00 SERVICE FEE FROM C07

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • DocketLetter Mailed for Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution: ON DECEMBER 14, 2015, CITATION RETURNED UNEXECUTED, DEFENDANT DOES NOT RESIDE AT ADDRESS PROVIDED PER SERVICE REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • DocketCitation Returned Unexecuted - Bad Address for Party: DEFENDANT DOES NOT LIVE AT ADDRESS PROVIDED PER SERVICE REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • DocketCITATION: RETURNED TO PLTF ATTY FOR SERVICE; WILKERSON, CONNIE: Returned Unserved 12/14/2015; Returned: 12/14/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • DocketAmended Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • DocketLetter Mailed for Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution: ON SEPTEMBER 29, 2015, CITATION WAS RETURNED UNEXECUTED, DEFENDANT MOVED, DOES NOT LIVE AT ADDRESS PROVIDED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • DocketCitation Returned Unexecuted - Bad Address for Party: DEFN MOVED PER C02 SERVICE REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • DocketCITATION: RETURNED TO PLTF ATTY FOR SERVICE; WILKERSON, CONNIE: Returned Unserved 09/29/2015; Returned: 09/29/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening): CC DUE $41.00 + $75.00 SERVICE FEE FROM PCT 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Arlington Independent School District is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHARLES E BRADY