Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 06/09/2021 at 05:09:47 (UTC).

AMERICAN LANDMARK-CANOPY ON CENTRAL vs. ROGELIO AGUILAR AND ALL OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 AMERICAN LANDMARK-CANOPY ON CENTRAL filed an Other lawsuit against ROGELIO AGUILAR AND ALL OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Brandt, William P. "Bill". The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************7370

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Brandt, William P. "Bill"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Landmark-Canopy on Central

2700 Central Dr

Bedford, TX 76021

Defendant

Aguilar, Rogelio

Bedford, TX 76021

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketCANCELED: Non-Jury Trial; (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Brandt, William P. "Bill") ; Non-Suit/Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Dismissed by Plaintiff or Nonsuited; (Judicial Officer: Brandt, William P. "Bill")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal Without Prejudice on Plaintiff's Motion: JUDGE APPROVED AND SIGNED; EMAILED TO PLTF AND MAILED TO DEFN; REMOVED FROM 5/06/21 CALENDAR ES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketMotion To Dismiss Filed by Plaintiff: BY EMAIL; PRESENTED TO JUDGE ES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCitation Returned: SERVED ON 4/20/21 @ 10:05 AM TO ROGELIO AGUILAR ES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketEVICTION: AGUILAR, ROGELIO: Served: 04/20/2021; Returned: 04/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued and Sent to C03 for Service: W/DIVERSION PROGRAM INFO. KNS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP3-2021-01965: American Landmark-Canopy on Central: (121.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff AMERICAN LANDMARK-CANOPY ON CENTRAL; Total Financial Assessment: 121.00; Total Payments and Credits: 121.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 121.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketEmail Consent by Plaintiff: KNS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCares Act Affidavit Filed: W/IN ORIG PET. KNS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketMilitary Affidavit Filed: W/IN ORIG PET. W/DOD. KNS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: SUBMITTED W/MIL AFF W/DOD, CARES ACT AFF, NTV & LEASE. KNS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening): HURST

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN LANDMARK-CANOPY ON CENTRAL is a litigant