Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 06/14/2021 at 10:38:48 (UTC).

AMERICAN LANDMARK-CANOPY ON CENTRAL vs. JESSE NIKWIGIZE, WINNIE GATERETSE AND ALL OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 AMERICAN LANDMARK-CANOPY ON CENTRAL filed an Other lawsuit against JESSE NIKWIGIZE, WINNIE GATERETSE AND ALL OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Brandt, William P. "Bill". The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************7369

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Brandt, William P. "Bill"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Landmark-Canopy on Central

2700 Central Dr

Bedford, TX 76021

Defendants

Nikwigize, Jesse

Bedford, TX 76021

Gateretse, Winnie

Bedford, TX 76021

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Judgment for Plaintiff; (Judicial Officer: Brandt, William P. "Bill") ; Judgment of $9,463.55; Awarded To: AMERICAN LANDMARK-CANOPY ON CENTRAL; Awarded Against: JESSE NIKWIGIZE, et al; Comment: RET OF PREM + $9,463.55 BR + CC @ 5% INT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketCourt Notes: EVIC CHECKLIST. KNS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketBond for Appeal Set: $2,310.00. KNS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketEvict -Judgment / Pltf / Poss/ Past Due Rent / CC: PLTF AND DEFNS APPEARED. RET OF PREM + $9,463.55 BR + CC @ 5% INT. COPY EMAILED TO PLTF AND MAILED TO DEFN. KNS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial: (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Brandt, William P. "Bill")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCitation Returned: SERVED ON 4/20/21 @ 9:55 AM TO WINNIE GATERETSE ES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCitation Returned: SERVED ON 4/20/21 @ 9:55 AM TO JESSE NIKWIGIZE ES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketEVICTION: NIKWIGIZE, JESSE: Served: 04/20/2021; Returned: 04/21/2021; GATERETSE, WINNIE: Served: 04/20/2021; Returned: 04/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued and Sent to C03 for Service: W/DIVERSION PROGRAM INFO. KNS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP3-2021-01964: American Landmark-Canopy on Central: (196.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff AMERICAN LANDMARK-CANOPY ON CENTRAL; Total Financial Assessment: 196.00; Total Payments and Credits: 196.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 196.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketEmail Consent by Plaintiff: KNS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCares Act Affidavit Filed: W/IN ORIG PET (1 PER DEFN). KNS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketMilitary Affidavit Filed: W/IN ORIG PET. W/DOD. KNS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: SUBMITTED W/MIL AFF W/DOD, CARES AFF (FOR EACH DEFN), NTV & LEASE. KNS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening): HURST

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN LANDMARK-CANOPY ON CENTRAL is a litigant