Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/25/2021 at 08:35:32 (UTC).

American Express National Bank vs Marvin Rudd aka Marvin P Rudd II

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 American Express National Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Marvin Rudd aka Marvin P Rudd II. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********04-3

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Express National Bank

Defendants

Rudd, Marvin

Benbrook, TX 76126

aka Marvin P Rudd II

Benbrook, TX 76126

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher Jonathan Mundt

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Judgment or Order Signed Index #10: Electronically served to Party's attorney and/or mailed to all pro-se parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Order of Non Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2021
  • DocketOrder for Non-Suit Index #9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Non-Suit Index #8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketPaper Returned Index #7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Judgment or Order Signed Index #6: Electronically served to Party's attorney and/or mailed to all pro-se parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketOrder for Rule 106 Index #5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketMotion Rule 106 w/Diligent Attempt Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-170258: American Express National Bank: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff American Express National Bank; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCitation: Hold for abc legal - picked up 03/04; Rudd, Marvin: Served: 03/30/2021; Returned: 04/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketLetter Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index #1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK is a litigant