This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 09/09/2021 at 08:09:11 (UTC).

American Express National Bank vs Clifford Praytor

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 American Express National Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Clifford Praytor. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********20-3

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Express National Bank

115 W Towne Ridge Parkway

Sandy, UT 84070

Defendants

Praytor, Clifford

Fort Worth, TX 76244

or at such other place as the Defendant may be found

Fort Worth, TX 76244

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brandi Marie Addison

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer Index # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-173974: American Express National Bank: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff American Express National Bank; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketCitation: Hold for ABC Legal 07/14/2021 p/u; Praytor, Clifford: Served: 07/21/2021; Returned: 07/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketLetter Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brandi Marie Addison