Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 06/02/2017 at 12:24:17 (UTC).

American Express Centurion Bank vs Gerald Evans

Case Summary

On 01/31/2017 American Express Centurion Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Gerald Evans. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********23-1

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Express Centurion Bank

Defendant

Evans, Gerald

North Richland Hills, TX 76180

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Elise D. Manchester

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2017
  • Paper Returned Doc ID#9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • Citation: ABC Legal; Evans, Gerald: Served: 05/22/2017; Returned: 05/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • Letter Requesting Alias Citation Doc ID#8:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • Order for Rule 106 Doc ID#7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Paper Returned Doc ID#6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Motion Rule 106 w/Diligent Attempt Doc ID#5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • Citation: Hold for ABC Legal; Evans, Gerald: Returned Unserved 04/06/2017; Returned: 04/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID#4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Letter Doc ID#3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Original Petition Doc ID#2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Original Petition Doc ID#1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-121825: American Express Centurion Bank: (4.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • Transaction Assessment: 4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-118766: American Express Centurion Bank: (253.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff American Express Centurion Bank; Total Financial Assessment: 257.00; Total Payments and Credits: 257.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 253.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Express Centurion Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elise D. Manchester