Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 02/28/2017 at 07:56:57 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK VS. ALAN MILLER

Case Summary

On 01/11/2013 AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK filed an Other lawsuit against ALAN MILLER. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Casey, Russell B. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************1668

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Casey, Russell B

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION

AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK

Defendant

MILLER, ALAN

Keller, TX 76248-2637

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STEVE A JAVANDOOST

Michael J Adams

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2013
  • Dispositions: Agreed Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Casey, Russell B.) ; Judgment of $4,557.93; Awarded To: AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK; Awarded Against: ALAN MILLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2013
  • Designation of Lead Counsel Filed: BY PLTF'S ATTY; ATTY UPDATED. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ATTACHED. PLACED IN CASE FILE. HMR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2013
  • Comments: AGREED JUDGMENT REVIEWED AND CONFORMED BY JUDGE. COPY RETURNED TO PLTF'S ATTY WITH SAME ALSO MAILED TO DEFN. AT ADDRESS ON AGREED JUDGMENT OF: 5177 BRITTON RDG LN, FORT WORTH, TX 76179 (PARTY SCREEN UPDATED)./BDM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • Comments: PLTF'S ATTY FAXED AN AGREED JUDGMENT SIGNED BY BOTH PARTIES IN REFERENCE TO THIS CAUSE FOR ENTRY BY THE COURT. PRESENTED TO JUDGE,/BDM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2013
  • Called Plaintiff's Attorney on this Case: RE: STATUS SINCE THEY DID NOT APPEAR FOR HEARING. MR. ADAMS SAID THE CASE HAS SETTLED AND FINAL DOCUMENTS WILL BE SENT TO CT IN NEAR FUTURE./BDM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • Comments: NO SHOW BY PLTF'S ATTY AT TIME OF PROVE UP HEARING./BDM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • Prove Up Hearings: (9:45 AM) (Judicial Officer Casey, Russell B.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2013
  • Hearing Letter Mailed: PROVE UP HEARING SET FOR 04/19/13 AT 945AM. MAILED NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES. (MAILED NOTICE TO DEFN AT SERVICE ADDRESS ON CITN AND ACTUAL ADDRESS LISTED ON ALIAS CITN.) CCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2013
  • Answer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2013
  • Citation Returned: ALIAS CITN RETURNED SERVED IN PERSON ON 02/09/13 AT DIFFERENT ADDRESS THAN ON CITN. SERVED AT 5177 BRITTON RIDGE LN FORT WORTH TX 76179 CCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2013
  • Comments: RANDY WITH ABC LEGAL PICKED UP PAPERWORK. CCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2013
  • CITATION: MILLER, ALAN: Served: 02/09/2013; Returned: 02/13/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2013
  • Alias Citation Requested: BY PPS. ORIGINAL CITN HAS PLTF STYLED INCORRECTLY. UPDATED PLTF AND ISSUED ALIAS AND PLACED IN ABC LEGAL FOLDER FOR PICKUP CCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2013
  • Comments: RANDY WITH ABC LEGAL PICKED UP PAPERWORK. CCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2013
  • CITATION: MILLER, ALAN: Returned Unserved 01/22/2013; Returned: 01/22/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2013
  • Comments: CITN ISSUED AND PLACED IN ABC LEGAL FOLDER FOR PICKUP CCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2013
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening): W/DISCOVERY ATTACHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2013
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # JP3-2013-00101: MICHAEL J ADAMS PC: (31.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2013
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK; Total Financial Assessment: 31.00; Total Payments and Credits: 31.00; Balance Due as of 02/28/2017: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 31.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Express Centurion Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steve A Javandoost

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael J. Adams