Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 03/30/2017 at 05:01:55 (UTC).

American Express Bank, FSB vs Channy N Salazar

Case Summary

On 02/13/2017 American Express Bank, FSB filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Channy N Salazar. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********24-2

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Express Bank, FSB

Defendant

Salazar, Channy N

North Richland Hills, TX 76182

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Elise D. Manchester

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2017
  • Paper Returned Doc ID#5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • Citation: mailed to aty; Salazar, Channy N: Served: 03/20/2017; Returned: 03/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2017
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID#4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2017
  • Letter Doc ID#3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2017
  • Original Petition Doc ID#2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2017
  • Original Petition Doc ID#1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-119178: American Express Bank, FSB: (253.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff American Express Bank, FSB; Total Financial Assessment: 253.00; Total Payments and Credits: 253.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 253.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB, A FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elise D. Manchester