This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/18/2017 at 15:14:25 (UTC).

ALTON MURRAY vs. INA MCMILLON AND ALL OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 08/21/2015 ALTON MURRAY filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against INA MCMILLON AND ALL OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 8 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Woodard, Lisa R. The case status is Pending - Appeal.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3060

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Appeal

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Woodard, Lisa R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MURRAY, ALTON

Defendant

MCMILLON {ONLY}, INA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2015
  • DocketDispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Woodard, Lisa R) ; Judgment; Awarded To: ALTON MURRAY; Awarded Against: INA MCMILLON {ONLY}

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • DocketTranscript of Judgment on Appeal Prepared: BTW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • DocketStatement of Inability to Pay for Appeal Not Contested: BTW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • DocketLetter Issued: TO PLAINTIFF AS NOTICE OF APPEAL ON SIP - BTW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • DocketEviction - Statement of Inability to Pay for Appeal Filed: BY DEFN * KEJ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • DocketEvict - Default Judgment for Possession & Court Costs: POSSESSION ONLY + CC - BTW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • DocketDefault Notice Mailed: BTW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • DocketHearing: (8:30 AM) (Judicial OfficerWoodard, Lisa R) : Result: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • DocketComments: RET EXECUTED VIA RULE 510.4C;COURT DATE 09/10/15 @8:30AM - BTW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • DocketEVICTION: MCMILLON {ONLY}, INA: Served: 08/28/2015; Returned: 08/28/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • DocketRequest For Alternate Service Filed and Approved: BTW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • DocketEVICTION: MCMILLON {ONLY}, INA: Returned Unserved 08/26/2015; Returned: 08/26/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • DocketGenerate Label

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening): PRINTED AND ISSUED TO C08..RDK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • DocketCounter Payment: Receipt # JP8-2015-02955: VALUED CUSTOMER: (116.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • DocketFinancial Information: Plaintiff MURRAY, ALTON; Total Financial Assessment: 116.00; Total Payments and Credits: 116.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 116.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less