This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 01/16/2022 at 08:34:32 (UTC).

Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company vs AT&T Mobility

Case Summary

On 11/01/2021 Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company filed an Other lawsuit against AT T Mobility. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Hrabal, Mike. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********46-3

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Hrabal, Mike

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company

Defendants

AT&T Mobility

North Palm Beach, FL 33408-3029

Attn: Global Legal Demand Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher J. Doyle

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketRule 306a Notice of Final DJ or Appealable Order Index # 5: Electronically served to Party's attorney and/or mailed to all pro-se parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Final Judgment After non Jury Trial; (Judicial Officer: Hrabal, Mike)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketJudgment - Final After Non Jury Index # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketJudge Docket Entry: Applicant appeared for R.202. Granted and S Ord.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketHearing: (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Hrabal, Mike) : Rule 202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing / Trial Index # 3: on 11/19/2021 @ 1:30pm via Zoom (202 Petition)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-177367: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company: (254.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company; Total Financial Assessment: 254.00; Total Payments and Credits: 254.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 254.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2: Petition for Rule 202 Deposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher J. Doyle