This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/17/2022 at 09:27:14 (UTC).

Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company vs T-Mobile & AT&T Mobility

Case Summary

On 10/28/2021 Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company filed an Other lawsuit against T-Mobile AT T Mobility. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Hrabal, Mike. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********93-3

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Hrabal, Mike

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company

an automobile property and casualty insurance company

Defendants

AT&T Mobility

North Palm Beach, FL 33408

Global Legal Demand Center

T-Mobile

4 Sylvan Way

Parsippany, NJ 07054

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher J. Doyle

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketRule 306a Notice of Final DJ or Appealable Order Index # 5: Electronically served to Party's attorney and/or mailed to all pro-se parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Final Judgment After non Jury Trial; (Judicial Officer: Hrabal, Mike)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketJudgment - Final After Non Jury Index # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketJudge Docket Entry: Applicant appeared for R.202. Granted and S Ord.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketHearing: (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Hrabal, Mike) : Rule 202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing / Trial Index # 3: Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-177307: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company: (254.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company; Total Financial Assessment: 254.00; Total Payments and Credits: 254.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 254.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2: Petition for Rule 202 Depositions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Global Legal Demand Center is a litigant

Latest cases where T-Mobile USA, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant