This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 09/21/2022 at 15:07:44 (UTC).

Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company vs T-Mobile

Case Summary

On 07/21/2022 Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company filed an Other lawsuit against T-Mobile. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court at Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Pierson, Don. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********95-1

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Pierson, Don

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company

Defendant

T-Mobile

4 Sylvan Way

Parsippany, NJ 07054

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher J. Doyle

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketHearing: (9:45 AM) (Judicial Officer Pierson, Don) : Amended Rule 202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's First Amended Petition Index # 6: for Rule 202 Depositions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Judgment or Order Signed Index # 5: Electronically Served to Party's Attorney and/or Mailed to all Pro-Se Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketOrder Index # 4: for Rule 202 Deposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketJudge Docket Entry: Zoom re 202. Mr Doyle for Movant. e sign order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketHearing: (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Pierson, Don) : Rule 202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Hearing / Trial Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (137.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-184230: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company: (213.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company; Total Financial Assessment: 350.00; Total Payments and Credits: 350.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 350.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2: Petition for Rule 202 Depositions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where T-Mobile USA, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher J. Doyle