This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 06/16/2022 at 12:00:50 (UTC).

Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company vs AT&T MOBILITY, VERIZON, T-Mobile

Case Summary

On 11/19/2021 Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company filed an Other lawsuit against AT T MOBILITY, VERIZON, T-Mobile. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Hrabal, Mike. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********17-3

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Hrabal, Mike

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company

Defendants

AT&T MOBILITY

North Palm Beach, FL 33408-3029

Global Legal Demand Center

T-MOBILE

4 Sylvan Way

Parsippany, NJ 07054

Verizon Security Assistance Team

Bedminister, NJ 07921

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher J. Doyle

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Judgment or Order Signed Index # 5: (Electronically Served to all Attorney's and/or Mailed to All Parties)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Dismissal by Plaintiff; (Judicial Officer: Hrabal, Mike) ; Party(; AT&T MOBILITY; Verizon Security Assistance Team; T-MOBILE; )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketOrder Index # 4: for Rule 202 Depositions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketJudge Docket Entry: Heard 202. Granted and S Ord.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketHearing: (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Hrabal, Mike) : Rule 202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing / Trial Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-177975: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company: (254.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company; Total Financial Assessment: 254.00; Total Payments and Credits: 254.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 254.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2: PETITION FOR RULE 202 DEPOSITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Global Legal Demand Center is a litigant

Latest cases where T-Mobile USA, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher J. Doyle