This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 07/05/2023 at 08:48:01 (UTC).

ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF REYNALDO GARZA vs. US TSUBAKI HOLDINGS INC., A/K/A U.S. TSUBAKI AUTOMOTIVE, LLC AND KEVIN JINERSON

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF REYNALDO GARZA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against US TSUBAKI HOLDINGS INC , A/K/A U S TSUBAKI AUTOMOTIVE, LLC AND KEVIN JINERSON. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Curnutt, Mary Tom. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************3610

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Curnutt, Mary Tom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF REYNALDO GARZA

Defendants

JINERSON, KEVIN

US TSUBAKI HOLDINGS INC., A/K/A U.S. TSUBAKI AUTOMOTIVE, LLC

c/o Corporation Service Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Faith Danielle Miller

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2023
  • DocketDispositions: Dismissed for Want of Prosecution; (Judicial Officer: Curnutt, Mary Tom)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal/Want of Prosecution W/O Prejudice Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2023
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up; (8:00 AM) () ; Non-Suit/Dismissed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • DocketLetter Mailed for Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution: SEE TEXAS RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE - RULE 503.1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up/3 Months; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketDispositions: One Party Non-Suited Before Trial; (Judicial Officer: Curnutt, Mary Tom)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: JP02-23-SC00023610 SERVICE AFFIDAVIT ON U.S. TSUBAKI HOLDINGS, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal/Non-Suit of 1 Defendant Only

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketProposed Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketNotice: Notice of Non Suit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP2-2023-00339: ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF REYNALDO GARZA: (33.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF REYNALDO GARZA; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketComments: CITNS EMAILED TO PLTF FOR SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCITATION: US TSUBAKI HOLDINGS INC., A/K/A U.S. TSUBAKI AUTOMOTIVE, LLC: Served: 01/19/2023; Returned: 01/25/2023; JINERSON, KEVIN: Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less