This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 04/29/2023 at 15:01:50 (UTC).

ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF NEELY S. HEIZER vs. GELCO FLEET TRUST 7-ELEVEN, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/20/2023 ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF NEELY S HEIZER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GELCO FLEET TRUST 7-ELEVEN, INC. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 3 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Brandt, William P. "Bill". The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************6338

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Brandt, William P. "Bill"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF NEELY S. HEIZER

Defendants

GELCO FLEET TRUST 7-ELEVEN, INC.

c/o Corporation Service Company d/b/a CSC-Lawyers Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Faith Danielle Miller

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2023
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up/3 Months; (9:00 AM) () ; Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketCANCELED: Prove Up Hearings; (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Brandt, William P. "Bill") ; Non-Suit/Dismissed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketEmailed: CORRECTED ORDER OF NON-SUIT TO PLTF AND MAILED TO DEFN. MB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketOrder of Non-Suit With Prejudice Entered: "CORRECTED ORDER". DEFN IMPROPERLY LISTED. MB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • DocketProposed Order: Corrected Proposed Order on Plaintiff's Notice of Non Suit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketDispositions: Dismissed by Plaintiff or Nonsuited; (Judicial Officer: Brandt, William P. "Bill")

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketEmailed: ORDER OF NON-SUIT TO PLTF ATTY. MB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketOrder of Non-Suit With Prejudice Entered: SIGNED BY JUDGE. COPY EMAILED TO PLTF ATTY AND MAILED TO DEFN. MB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketProposed Order: OF NON-SUIT WITH PREJUDICE. MB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit Filed: BY PLTF. PRESENTED TO JUDGE. MB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketAnswer Due On: MB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketCitation Returned: W/ AFFIDAVIT. DEFN SERVED IN PERSON B/S REGISTERED AGENT - CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY ON 1-25-2023 @ 3:18 PM AT 211 E 7TH STREET, SUITE 620, AUSTIN, TX 78701 BY PPS. MB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP3-2023-00354: ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF NEELY S. HEIZER: (33.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF NEELY S. HEIZER; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketEmailed: PETITION AND CITATION TO PLTF ATTY FOR SERVICE BY PPS. MB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketCITATION: GELCO FLEET TRUST 7-ELEVEN, INC.: Served: 01/25/2023; Returned: 01/27/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketCitation Issued: AND EMAILED TO PLTF ATTY FOR SERVICE BY PPS. MB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less