This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 02/04/2021 at 21:13:29 (UTC).

ALLIANCE TRUCKING, LP vs. LEGACY ACRES DEVELOPMENT AND AMONDO PERRY

Case Summary

On 07/24/2020 ALLIANCE TRUCKING, LP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LEGACY ACRES DEVELOPMENT AND AMONDO PERRY. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Curnutt, Mary Tom. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************1759

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Curnutt, Mary Tom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLIANCE TRUCKING, LP

721 111Th Street

Arlington, TX 76011

Defendants

PERRY, AMONDO

Mansfield, TX 76063

LEGACY ACRES DEVELOPMENT

102 Monticello Dr

Mansfield, TX 76063

B/S AMONDO PERRY

Mansfield, TX 76063

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up/3 Months; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketDispositions: Dismissed for Want of Prosecution; (Judicial Officer: Curnutt, Mary Tom)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal/Want of Prosecution W/O Prejudice Entered: NO PARTIES APPEARED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketProve Up Hearings: (1:30 PM) (Judicial OfficerCurnutt, Mary Tom) : Result: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff Requested Default Prove-Up Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketLetter Mailed for Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution: SEE TEXAS RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE - RULE 503.1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow up/ Answer Due; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • FinancialCounter Payment: Receipt # JP2-2020-02973: ERIC DANCE: (196.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff ALLIANCE TRUCKING, LP; Total Financial Assessment: 196.00; Total Payments and Credits: 196.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketEmail Consent by Plaintiff: SEE PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketMilitary Status Proof Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketCITATION: C07; LEGACY ACRES DEVELOPMENT: Served: 07/28/2020; Returned: 07/30/2020; PERRY, AMONDO: Served: 07/28/2020; Returned: 07/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLIANCE TRUCKING LP is a litigant