Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 06/21/2021 at 09:39:41 (UTC).

Allegheny Resources LLC vs Skyline Builders LLC dba Skyline Builders and Parminder Singh, SSN XXX-XX-X345, an individual

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 Allegheny Resources LLC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against Skyline Builders LLC dba Skyline Builders and Parminder Singh, SSN XXX-XX-X345, an individual. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Hrabal, Mike. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********54-3

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Hrabal, Mike

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Allegheny Resources LLC

9980 S 300 W #200

Sandy, UT 84070

Defendants

SSN XXX-XX-X345, an individual

Baytown, TX 77521-9795

Singh, Parminder

Baytown, TX 77521-9795

Skyline Builders LLC

4914 Bentonite Blvd

Baytown, TX 77521-9795

d/b/a Skyline Builders

4914 Bentonite Blvd

Baytown, TX 77521-9795

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kimberly A. Guest

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketOath Index # 11: of receiver// 06-15-2021 QC completed VS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Judgment or Order Signed Index # 10: Electronically Served to all Attorney's and/or Mailed to All Parties.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketOrder for Turnover Index # 9: & Order Appointing Receiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketJudge Docket Entry: Heard mtn for rec. D did not appear. Granted and S Ord.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketMotion for Receiver: (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Hrabal, Mike)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketLetter Index # 8: Proposed Order for turnover

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketApplication for Turnover Index # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-168845: Allegheny Resources LLC: (254.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Allegheny Resources LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 254.00; Total Payments and Credits: 254.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 254.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Final Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Hrabal, Mike)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketLetter Index # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketNotice Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketFinal Judgment Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLEGHENY RESOURCES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kimberly A. Guest