This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 06/09/2022 at 08:08:37 (UTC).

Alicia Morrison, Individually and as Next Friend of E.V., a minor vs The City of Fort Worth, Texas

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 Alicia Morrison, Individually and as Next Friend of E filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against , a minor. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Pierson, Don. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********59-1

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Pierson, Don

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Morrison, Alicia

Defendants

The City of Fort Worth, Texas

Fort Worth, TX 76102

a municipal corporation

b/s its mayor, city clerk, secretary or treasurer

City Hall

Minor

V., E.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard A. Stucky

Defendant Attorney

Destiney Hicks

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2023
  • DocketWeek of Jury Trial Scheduling Only (Disregard Start Time): (7:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Pierson, Don)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketAgreed Scheduling Order Index # 5: Electronically Served to Party's Attorney and/or Mailed to all Pro-Se Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer Index # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 3: The City of Fort Worth, Texas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (137.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-179291: Morrison, Alicia: (221.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Morrison, Alicia; Total Financial Assessment: 358.00; Total Payments and Credits: 358.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 358.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketCitation: Mailed to Attorney 1/25/2022; The City of Fort Worth, Texas: Served: 02/09/2022; Returned: 02/09/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY HALL is a litigant

Latest cases where a municipal corporation and a chartered city is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard A Stucky