Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 04/19/2021 at 07:40:43 (UTC).

ALFONSO ROMERO vs. BRYAN PINEDA

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 ALFONSO ROMERO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BRYAN PINEDA. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************2103

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROMERO, ALFONSO

Arlington, TX 76010

Defendant

PINEDA, BRYAN

Arlington, TX 76018

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up/3 Months; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow up/ Answer Due; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCITATION: ROMERO, ALFONSO: Served: 03/31/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • FinancialCounter Payment: Receipt # JP2-2021-01497: PINEDA, BRYAN: (121.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Counter Plaintiff PINEDA, BRYAN; Total Financial Assessment: 121.00; Total Payments and Credits: 121.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 121.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketMilitary Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCounter Claim Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketEmail Consent by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketComments: RETURNED CITATION TO C07 FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketOrder Approving Alternate Service Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketAffidavit for Alternate Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialCounter Payment: Receipt # JP2-2021-00985: ROMERO, ALFONSO: (121.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Counter Defendant ROMERO, ALFONSO; Total Financial Assessment: 121.00; Total Payments and Credits: 121.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketMilitary Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCITATION: C07; PINEDA, BRYAN: Served: 03/17/2021; Returned: 03/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less