This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 02/06/2019 at 04:35:57 (UTC).

AK Housing, LLC vs. Tower Residential I Condominium Association, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/08/2019 AK Housing, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Tower Residential I Condominium Association, Inc. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************3530

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Housing, LLC, AK

Defendant

Condominium Association, Inc., Tower Residential I

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2019
  • Dispositions: Dismissed by Plaintiff or Nonsuited

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • CANCELED: Clerk Follow Up; (8:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerSwearingin, Ralph, JR) ; Non-Suit/Dismissed; PLTF TO SUBMIT DISMISSAL PER MEDIATOR NOTES//APG; 04/11/2019; Reset by Court to 02/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Order of Dismissal With Prejudice on Plaintiff's Motion: COPY MLD TO ALL PARTIES//DE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Motion for Agreed Dismissal Filed: Agreed Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice//EFILED//DE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Comments: CT NOTES: RELATES CASES WERE MEDIAITED AT PTM WITH THIS CASE. DISMISSAL TO BE ENTERED IN 30 DAYS//IF NOT, ISSUE CITATION AND PROCEED WITH CASE//APG APG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • EFile Original Petition Document: Plaintiff's Original Petition//EFILE// MAIL TO PLTF/ NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Internet Payment: Receipt # JP1TF-2019-00118: Housing, LLC, AK: (48.25)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff Housing, LLC, AK; Total Financial Assessment: 48.25; Total Payments and Credits: 48.25; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 48.25

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION is a litigant