Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 03/30/2017 at 05:25:44 (UTC).

Advanced Glass Systems, Inc. vs G. L. Barron Company, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/21/2017 Advanced Glass Systems, Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against G L Barron Company, Inc. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********26-3

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Advanced Glass Systems, Inc.

Defendants

G. L. Barron Company, Inc.

6221 Southwest Blvd., Ste. 100

Fort Worth, TX 76132

b/s Gregg L. Barron, registered agent

Fort Worth, TX 76132

b/s Greg L. Barron, Registered Agent

Fort Worth, TX 76132

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph R. Kimball, II

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2017
  • Paper Returned Doc ID#6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • Citation: Placed in Constable Box; G. L. Barron Company, Inc.: Served: 03/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • Letter Doc ID#5: re: Citation Request via Constable

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • Plaintiff's First Amended Petition Doc ID#4: Duplicate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • Plaintiff's First Amended Petition Doc ID#3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Citation: mail to attorney; G. L. Barron Company, Inc.: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • Original Petition Doc ID#2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • Original Petition Doc ID#1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-119878: Advanced Glass Systems, Inc.: (84.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • Transaction Assessment: 84.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-119583: Advanced Glass Systems, Inc.: (253.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff Advanced Glass Systems, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment: 337.00; Total Payments and Credits: 337.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 253.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph R. Kimball, II