This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 01/03/2022 at 04:32:28 (UTC).

Absolute Resolutions Investments Llc vs. Maria Rodriguez

Case Summary

On 11/12/2021 Absolute Resolutions Investments Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Maria Rodriguez. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0262

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Absolute Resolutions Investments Llc

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

Rodriguez, Maria

Fort Worth, TX 76131

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew W. Cooper

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketEmailed: ORD TO PLTF/DEFN NOT SERVD//CA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Dismissed by Plaintiff or Nonsuited; (Judicial Officer: Swearingin, Ralph, JR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketOrder of Non-Suit Without Prejudice Entered: //CA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit Filed: EFILED WITHOUT PREJ//DE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketCover Letter Filed: Cover Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketEmailed: TO PLTF//KAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketOption Letter Mailed: KAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: NON-SERVICE RETURN//EFILED//KAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketCITATION: EMAILED TO MJSCOURTS@ABCLEGAL.COM//HG; Rodriguez, Maria: Returned Unserved 12/07/2021; Returned: 12/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketEmailed: TO PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER//HG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1-2021-01844: Absolute Resolutions Investments Llc: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Absolute Resolutions Investments Llc; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: EFILED//EMAIL TO: mjscourts@abclegal.com //KAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Absolute Resolutions Investments, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew W Cooper