This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 10/17/2021 at 07:31:21 (UTC).

Absolute Resolutions Investments Llc vs. Gerardo Gutierrez

Case Summary

On 09/16/2021 Absolute Resolutions Investments Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Gerardo Gutierrez. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************4705

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Absolute Resolutions Investments Llc

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

Gutierrez, Gerardo

Arlington, TX 76011

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew W. Cooper

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up/3 Months; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketClerk Follow up/ Answer Due: (8:00 AM) ()

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: Return of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketEmailed: ALTERNATE SERVICE TO PPS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketOrder Approving Alternate Service Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketMotion Filed: Citations Returned Unexecuted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketAffidavit for Alternate Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP2-2021-04632: Absolute Resolutions Investments Llc: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Absolute Resolutions Investments Llc; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketMilitary Unknown

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketCITATION: EMAILED TO MJSCOURTS@ABC LEGAL.; Gutierrez, Gerardo: Served: 09/30/2021; Returned: 09/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Absolute Resolutions Investments, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew W Cooper