Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 07/09/2021 at 10:30:37 (UTC).

Absolute Resolutions Investments Llc vs. Angela L. Pollard

Case Summary

On 06/15/2021 Absolute Resolutions Investments Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Angela L Pollard. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************6088

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Absolute Resolutions Investments Llc

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

Pollard, Angela L.

Hurst, TX 76054

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew W. Cooper

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketClerk Follow Up: (8:00 AM) ()

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added): BY ABC LEGAL. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCitation Returned Unexecuted - Bad Address for Party: BY ABC LEGAL. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP3-2021-02945: Absolute Resolutions Investments Llc: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Absolute Resolutions Investments Llc; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketCITATION: Pollard, Angela L.: Returned Unserved 06/17/2021; Returned: 06/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED TO ABC LEGAL FOR SERVICE. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Attorney Cover Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening): PLAINTIFF'S LAW FIRM: SCOTT & ASSOCIATES, P.C. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Absolute Resolutions Investments, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew W Cooper