Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 06/05/2021 at 04:34:42 (UTC).

AARON EVANS,MICAH EVANS vs. ERIC GOMEZ,ISIS ROBINSON

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 AARON EVANS,MICAH EVANS filed an Other lawsuit against ERIC GOMEZ,ISIS ROBINSON. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3636

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AARON EVANS

Fort Worth, TX 76179

MICAH EVANS

Fort Worth, TX 76179

Defendants

GOMEZ, ERIC

Fort Worth, TX 76131

ROBINSON, ISIS

Fort Worth, TX 76131

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketEmailed: TO ALL PARTIES//HG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Judgment for Plaintiff; (Judicial Officer: Swearingin, Ralph, JR) ; Judgment; Awarded To: AARON EVANS, et al; Awarded Against: ERIC GOMEZ, et al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketE-Mail Received by Court: PLTF AGT EMAIL 3 DAY NOTICE TO VACATE PLUSE EMAIL OF 45 DAY NOTICE/KAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketE-Court Trial: (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Swearingin, Ralph, JR) : EV ZOOM HEARING/ZOOM LINK: https://txcourts.zoom.us/j/91021197076 //KAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketE-Mail Received by Court: CONF TO ATTEND HEARING WITH EMAIL ADDRESS/KAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: EXECUTED//KAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: EXECUTED//KAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketCITATION: 2 DEFNS/KAC; GOMEZ, ERIC: Served: 04/20/2021; Returned: 04/20/2021; ROBINSON, ISIS: Served: 04/20/2021; Returned: 04/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketEmailed: TO PLTF//KAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketEVD PROGRAM - PPT Form Sent to PLTF: ALONG WITH THE AGREED REQUEST TO PARTICIPATE IN THE EVD PROGRAM//KAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketMailed: TO PLTF/KAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketEmailed: ZOOM HEARING NOTIFICATION TO PLTF Y/KAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing: ATTACHED TO DEFN CIT/MLD AND EMAILED TO PLTF//KAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1TF-2021-02152: AARON EVANS: (196.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff AARON EVANS; Total Financial Assessment: 196.00; Total Payments and Credits: 196.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 196.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCares Act Affidavit Filed: CARES ACT AFFIDAVIT FILED/KAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketUpdated Party Information: KAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketUpdated Party Information: KAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: EFILED/ MIL AFF W PROOF/VC FOR EDP /POSS ONLY//KAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less