This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 12/22/2019 at 09:52:07 (UTC).

47 Brand, LLC vs RK Pinnacle Sports, LLC d/b/a Pro Image Sports

Case Summary

On 08/26/2019 47 Brand, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RK Pinnacle Sports, LLC d/b/a Pro Image Sports. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********62-2

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

47 Brand, LLC

Defendants

RK Pinnacle Sports, LLC

d/b/a Pro Image Sports

b/s Registered Agent, Rahim Kurji

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew C. Jameson

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2019
  • Letter Doc ID#7: Cover letter re: Proposed Default Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • Affidavit of Attorney Fees Doc ID#6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • Certificate of Last Known Address Doc ID#5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • Paper Returned Doc ID#4: Return of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • Citation: Mail to Attorney; RK Pinnacle Sports, LLC: Served: 11/08/2019; Returned: 11/19/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • Letter Doc ID#3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • Original Petition Doc ID#2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • Original Petition Doc ID#1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-151636: 47 Brand, LLC: (258.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff 47 Brand, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less