Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 09/05/2020 at 15:36:59 (UTC).

2000 Walnut Plaza, LLC vs Stanley K. Fong, Sofia S. Fong, and The Woodmont Company

Case Summary

On 07/03/2019 2000 Walnut Plaza, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Stanley K Fong, Sofia S Fong, and The Woodmont Company. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********37-1

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

2000 Walnut Plaza, LLC

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

b/s Registered Agent, Stephen Coslik

Fort Worth, TX 76107

Fong, Sofia S.

Freemont, CA 94539

Fong, Stanley K.

Freemont, CA 94539

The Woodmont Company

2100 W. Seventh St.

Fort Worth, TX 76107

Cross Defendant

Fong, Stanley

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jake L.owell Robinson

Jake Lowell Robinson

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

PAUL J VITANZA

LARRY W JOHNSON

Roland P Schafer

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketVacation Letter Index #12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Judgment or Order Signed Index #10: Emailed to all atty's

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketOrder Index #11: Agreed Protective

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketMotion: for Entry of Agreed Protective Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketVacation Letter Index #9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-153725: The Woodmont Company: (80.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Defendant The Woodmont Company; Total Financial Assessment: 80.00; Total Payments and Credits: 80.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • DocketDefendant's First Amended Original Answer Index #8: and Original Cross-Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer Index #7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Judgment or Order Signed Index #6: Copy Electronically Served to atty's

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketOrder to Withdraw & Substitute Counsel Index #5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • DocketMotion to Withdraw & Substitute Counsel Index #4: Agreed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-149482: 2000 Walnut Plaza, LLC: (542.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff 2000 Walnut Plaza, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 542.00; Total Payments and Credits: 542.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 542.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketCitation: Certified Mail),***Q.C. Complete, 03/10/2020.; Fong, Stanley K.: Unserved ; Fong, Sofia S.: Unserved ; The Woodmont Company: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index #2: and Request for Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index #1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WOODMONT COMPANIES is a litigant