This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/18/2017 at 17:25:37 (UTC).

1401 Morrison LP vs. FAITH FLEMING AND ALL OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 10/12/2015 1401 Morrison LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against FAITH FLEMING AND ALL OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 8 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Woodard, Lisa R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3560

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Woodard, Lisa R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

1401 Morrison LP

Defendant

FLEMING, FAITH D

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2015
  • DocketDispositions: Judgment for Plaintiff; (Judicial Officer: Woodard, Lisa R) ; Judgment of $453.85; Awarded To: 1401 Morrison LP; Awarded Against: FAITH FLEMING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned - Cancelled: ..RDK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION: FLEMING, FAITH D: Returned Unserved 11/10/2015; Returned: 11/10/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • DocketWrit of Possession Requested: BY PLTF * KEJ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • DocketEvict -Judgment / Pltf / Poss/ Past Due Rent / CC: OF $453.85 + CC - BTW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • DocketHearing: (8:30 AM) (Judicial OfficerWoodard, Lisa R) : Result: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • DocketComments: RET EXECUTED TO FAITH FLEMING;COURT DATE 10/29/15 AT 8:30AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2015
  • DocketEVICTION: FLEMING, FAITH D: Served: 10/13/2015; Returned: 10/14/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2015
  • DocketGenerate Label

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2015
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • DocketCounter Payment: Receipt # JP8-2015-03942: LONDONDERRY-1401 MORRISON LP: (155.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • DocketTransaction Assessment: 155.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2015
  • DocketCounter Payment: Receipt # JP8-2015-03597: LONDONDERRY - 1401 MORRISON LP: (116.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2015
  • DocketFinancial Information: Plaintiff 1401 Morrison LP; Total Financial Assessment: 271.00; Total Payments and Credits: 271.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 116.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 1401 MORRISON, LP DBA TUSCANY (LONDONDERRY) is a litigant