This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 11/26/2018 at 14:02:50 (UTC).

The State of Texas vs. Robert Gatling

Case Summary

On 02/18/2009 The State of Texas filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Robert Gatling. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 2, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4776

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 2, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The State of Texas

Pasadena, TX 77506

Defendants

Smith, Robin V

Gatling, Robert

Houston, TX 77064

Gatling, Robert A

Houston, TX 77064

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2014
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2014
  • Bond Forfeiture-Release of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2014
  • Writ of Execution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • Bond Forfeiture-Writ of Execution Money Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • Bond Forfeiture-Abstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2014
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2014
  • Bond Forfeiture-Writ of Execution Money Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2012
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2009
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2009
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2009
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2012
  • Hearing: Judge Trial; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2014
  • Judgment: Parties For: The State of Texas; Parties Against: Gatling, Robert A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2014
  • Disposition: All Other Dispositions (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less