This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/04/2018 at 13:38:04 (UTC).

The State of Texas vs. Naaman Lockhart Aka Naaman Earl Lockhart Aka N.E. Lockhart

Case Summary

On 10/04/2010 The State of Texas filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Naaman Lockhart Aka Naaman Earl Lockhart Aka N E Lockhart. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3001

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State of Texas

Defendants

Naaman Lockhart Aka Naaman Earl Lockhart Aka N.E. Lockhart

Houston, TX 77026

Prince, Lennon S

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2012
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2012
  • Bond Forfeiture-Writ of Execution Money Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2012
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2012
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2011
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2011
  • Answer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2011
  • Answer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2010
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2010
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2010
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2010
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2012
  • Hearing: Judge Trial; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2012
  • Judgment: Parties For: State of Texas; Parties Against: Naaman Lockhart Aka Naaman Earl Lockhart Aka N.E. Lockhart and others

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2012
  • Disposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less