Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 04/13/2017 at 18:36:58 (UTC).

The Reserve at Autumn Creek vs. Chris Mounce

Case Summary

On 10/14/2004 The Reserve at Autumn Creek filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Chris Mounce. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 2, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3503

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 2, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Reserve at Autumn Creek

3102 West Bay Area Blvd

Friendswood, TX 77546

Defendant

Mounce, Chris

Friendswood, TX 77546

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2004
  • Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2004
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2004
  • Eviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2004
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2004
  • Eviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2004
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2004
  • Event: Judge Trial; Completion: Held; Completion Date: Thu Oct 28 09:00:00 CDT 2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2004
  • Judgment: Parties For: The Reserve at Autumn Creek; Parties Against: Mounce, Chris

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2004
  • Disposition: Dismissed for Want of Prosecution (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less