Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 04/24/2017 at 22:10:00 (UTC).

Tauheedah S Muwwakkil vs. R Kelly, Hach

Case Summary

On 09/09/2002 Tauheedah S Muwwakkil filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against R Kelly, Hach. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 6, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2870

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 6, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Muwwakkil, Tauheedah S

Houston, TX 77020

Defendants

Kelly, R

Houston, TX 77020

Hach

1119 Grove

Houston, TX 77020

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Bastine, Volly C

2640 Fountainview Suite 409

Houston, TX 77057-2971

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2003
  • Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2002
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2002
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2002
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2002
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2003
  • Event: Judge Trial; Completion: Dismissed; Completion Date: Thu Jun 05 09:00:00 CDT 2003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2003
  • Event: Judge Trial; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Thu May 29 09:00:00 CDT 2003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2003
  • Event: Judge Trial; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Thu Apr 24 09:00:00 CDT 2003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2002
  • Event: Show Cause Hearing; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Thu Sep 12 09:00:00 CDT 2002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2003
  • Judgment: Parties For: Muwwakkil, Tauheedah S; Parties Against: Kelly, R and others

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2003
  • Disposition: All Other Dispositions (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less