Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 04/18/2017 at 06:44:54 (UTC).

Sylvia Garcia vs. Faustino Posada

Case Summary

On 04/14/2003 Sylvia Garcia filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Faustino Posada. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 6, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3300

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 6, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Garcia, Sylvia

Pasadena, TX 77504

Defendant

Posada, Faustino

Houston, TX 77011

Material Witness

Ramirez, Steve

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2003
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2003
  • Subpoena Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2003
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2003
  • Subpoena Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2003
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2003
  • Subpoena

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2003
  • Small Claims-Citation Money Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2003
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2003
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2003
  • Event: Judge Trial; Completion: Held; Completion Date: Thu Nov 20 09:00:00 CST 2003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2003
  • Event: Judge Trial; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Thu Oct 16 09:00:00 CDT 2003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2003
  • Event: Judge Trial; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Mon Oct 06 09:00:00 CDT 2003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2003
  • Event: Judge Trial; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Thu Oct 02 09:00:00 CDT 2003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2003
  • Judgment: Parties For: Garcia, Sylvia; Parties Against: Posada, Faustino and others; Post-Judgment Interest: 5.00%

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2003
  • Disposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less